Voltage Pictures, LLC v. Does 1-22

Plaintiff: Voltage Pictures, LLC
Defendant: Does 1-22
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv01121
Filed: April 26, 2013
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: Wiley Y. Daniel
Referring Judge: Michael E. Hegarty
 
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
July 9, 2013 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying without prejudice 13 Defendant Doe No. 15's Motion to Sever and Motion to Quash Subpoena. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 7/9/13.(mjgsl, )
July 15, 2013 21 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice the following motions: 17 Defendant Doe No. 15's Motion to Quash Subpoena, 18 Doe No. 15's Motion to Sever, and 19 Doe No. 15's Motion to Proceed Anonymously. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 7/15/2013. (mehcd)
August 7, 2013 28 Opinion or Order of the Court RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE. It is Recommended that Doe 15's Amended Motion to Quash 22 be Denied by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 08/07/13. (jjhsl, )
August 7, 2013 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER on Motion to Quash. Doe No. 15's Amended Motion to Quash 22 is DENIED by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 08/07/13.(jjhsl, )
August 14, 2013 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. ORDERED that Defendant Doe Nos. 4 and 12 are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i), and shall hereafter be taken off the caption by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 08/14/13. (jjhsl, )
August 15, 2013 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Affirming and Adopting Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge. ORDERED that the Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge 27 is AFFIRMED AND ADOPTED. Plaintiff's Objection to the Recommendation 31 is OVERRULED. ORDERED that Doe No. 15's Amended Motion to Sever 23 is DENIED by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 08/15/13.(jjhsl, )
October 1, 2013 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Defendant Doe Nos. 13, 16, and 22 are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i), and shall hereafter be taken off the caption, by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 10/1/2013. (trlee, )
January 17, 2014 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER of Dismissal Without Prejudice by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 01/17/14. (jjhsl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Voltage Pictures, LLC v. Does 1-22
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Voltage Pictures, LLC
Represented By: Scott Thomas Kannady
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-22
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]