Guice v. Davis et al

Respondent: Attorney General of the State of Colorado, The and John Davis
Petitioner: Darrel Guice
Case Number: 1:2013cv01134
Filed: April 29, 2013
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Chaffee
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 6, 2013 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER to Supplement Pre-Answer Response, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 8/06/2013. (skl)
August 15, 2013 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER of Dismissal. ORDERED that the Application is DENIED and the action is DISMISSED without prejudice. No certificate of appealability will issue. Leave to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal is denied, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 8/15/13. (sgrim)
August 15, 2013 16 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT re: 15 Order of Dismissal, by Clerk on 8/15/13. (sgrim)
May 1, 2013 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Directing Applicant to File Amended Application, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 5/01/2013. (skl)
June 4, 2013 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER to File Pre-Answer Response, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 6/04/2013. (skl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Guice v. Davis et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Attorney General of the State of Colorado, The
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: John Davis
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Darrel Guice
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]