DeAtley v. Stuart et al

Defendant: Jolie Masterson and Martin Stuart
Plaintiff: Alan DeAtley
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv01140
Filed: April 30, 2013
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Referring Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Presiding Judge: Robert E. Blackburn
 
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity - Legal Malpractice
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
May 30, 2013 15 Featured Case ORDER setting Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference and Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting for 7/23/2013 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland. By Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 5/30/2013. (klyon, )
October 28, 2013 43 Featured Case ORDER denying 20 Motion to Stay; granting 24 Motion for Bond. Supplemental certificate of review to be filed under restricted level 2 by 11/12/13. by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 10/28/13.(bnbcd, )
February 24, 2014 56 Featured Case ORDER Adopting 51 Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge. This case is DISMISSED without prejudice. The Defendants' Motion To Dismiss for Failure To File Certificate of Review [# 30 ] filed August 14, 2013, is DENIED as moot. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 2/24/2014. (klyon, )
February 25, 2014 57 Featured Case JUDGMENT by Clerk in favor of Jolie Masterson, Martin Stuart against Alan DeAtley re: 56 Order Dismissing Case, by Clerk on 2/25/2014. (klyon, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: DeAtley v. Stuart et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jolie Masterson
Represented By: Andrew James Gustus
Represented By: June Baker Laird
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martin Stuart
Represented By: Andrew James Gustus
Represented By: June Baker Laird
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alan DeAtley
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]