Trejo v. Colvin

Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Plaintiff: Crystal E. A. Trejo
Interested_party: SSA Noticing
Case Number: 1:2013cv01145
Filed: April 30, 2013
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Pueblo
Presiding Judge: John L. Kane
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 18, 2013 13 Opinion or Order of the Court JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN FOR SOCIAL SECURITY CASES (ORDER). SS Plaintiffs Brief due by 10/28/2013. SS Defendants Brief due by 11/27/2013. SS Plaintiffs Reply Brief due by 12/12/2013. By Judge John L. Kane on 9/18/13. (mnfsl, )
January 15, 2014 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 19 Unopposed Motion to Remand for Further Administrative Proceedings. This civil action is remanded to Defendant for additional administrative proceedings pursuant to sentence four of 42 U.S.C. § 405(g). The Clerk is directed to enter a judgment in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 58. By Judge John L. Kane on 1/15/14.(mnfsl, )
January 16, 2014 21 Opinion or Order of the Court FINAL JUDGMENT, re: 20 Order. By Clerk on 1/16/14. (mnfsl, )
March 31, 2014 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 24 Motion for Attorney Fees by Judge John L. Kane on 03/31/14.(jhawk, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trejo v. Colvin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crystal E. A. Trejo
Represented By: Michael W. Seckar
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested_party: SSA Noticing
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]