Davis v. Property & Casualty Insurance Company of Hartford

Defendant: Property & Casualty Insurance Company of Hartford
Plaintiff: Kimberly I. Davis
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv01163
Filed: May 2, 2013
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Larimer
Presiding Judge: Christine M. Arguello
Referring Judge: Kathleen M. Tafoya
 
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
May 14, 2013 12 Featured Case ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference. Scheduling Conference set for 7/24/2013 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. The parties shall submit their proposed scheduling order on or before 7/17/13, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 5/14/13. (sgrim)
May 14, 2013 13 Featured Case ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference. Scheduling Conference set for 7/24/2013 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 5/14/13. (sgrim)
May 2, 2014 32 Featured Case ORDER granting in part and denying in part 26 Motion for Leave to Increase the Number of Retained Experts. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 05/02/2014. (athom, )
August 5, 2014 38 Featured Case ORDER re 37 Motion to Dismiss. This action is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, each party to pay his, her or its own costs and attorneys' fees. By Judge Christine M. Arguello on 08/05/2014.(athom, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Davis v. Property & Casualty Insurance Company of Hartford
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Property & Casualty Insurance Company of Hartford
Represented By: Lawrence Michael Brooks, Jr.
Represented By: Michelle Brand Muhleisen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly I. Davis
Represented By: Steven Billy Ray
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]