Purzel Video GmbH v. Does 64, 69, 74, 76, 77, 79, 81, 85, 87, 92, 93, 94, 95, 97, 98, 101, 102, 103, 104, 105, 106, 107, 112, 113 and 114

Plaintiff: Purzel Video GmbH
Defendant: Does 64, 69, 74, 76, 77, 79, 81, 85, 87, 92, 93, 94, 95, 97, 98, 101, 102, 103, 104, 105, 106, 107, 112, 113 and 114
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv01167
Filed: May 2, 2013
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: XX Outside US
Presiding Judge: Wiley Y. Daniel
Referring Judge: Michael E. Hegarty
 
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
May 7, 2013 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 4 Plaintiff's Motion and Memorandum for Leave to Take Discovery Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 5/7/2013. (mehcd)
July 17, 2013 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. ORDERED that defendant, Doe No. 103, is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE from this action. ORDERED that plaintiff, Purzel Video GmbH, shall amend the case caption on future filings to reflect the dismissal of Doe No. 103 by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 07/17/13. (jjhsl, )
November 12, 2013 49 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 45 Motion for Withdrawal of 37 Clerk's Entry of Default as to Benito Smoak and Don Tyslan. The Clerk of the Court shallwithdraw its entry of default as to Benito Smoak and Don Tyslan found at docket 37 . By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 11/12/2013. (mehcd)
December 19, 2013 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Affirming and Adopting Recommendation of the United States Magistrate Judge. ORDERED that the Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge Hegarty 54 is AFFIRMED and ADOPTED. ORDERED that Plaintiffs Motion to Dismiss Defendant Inge's Counterclaims and to Strike Defendant Inges Affirmative Defenses 40 is GRANTED. Defendant's affirmative defenses at 19, 20, 22, 23, 21(2nd), 22(2nd), and 26 are STRICKEN by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 12/19/13.(jjhsl, )
January 6, 2014 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Affirming and Adopting Recommendation of the United States Magistrate Judge. ORDERED that the Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge Hegarty(ECF No. 55) is AFFIRMED and ADOPTED by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 01/06/14.(jjhsl, )
January 28, 2014 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: 58 Stipulation filed by Purzel Video GmbH, Geoff Inge is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE from this action, with each party to pay its own attorney fees and costs, by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 1/28/2014. (evana, )
May 5, 2014 63 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting in part and denying in part 60 Plaintiffs Combined Motion to Compel Discovery against Benito Smoak, to Modify the Discovery Schedule, and for Attorneys Fees, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 5/5/2014.(evana, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Purzel Video GmbH v. Does 64, 69, 74, 76, 77, 79, 81, 85, 87, 92, 93, 94, 95, 97, 98, 101, 102, 103, 104, 105, 106, 107, 112, 113 and 114
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Purzel Video GmbH
Represented By: Paul Alan Lesko
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 64, 69, 74, 76, 77, 79, 81, 85, 87, 92, 93, 94, 95, 97, 98, 101, 102, 103, 104, 105, 106, 107, 112, 113 and 114
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]