Wagner Equipment CO. v. FedEx Freight, Inc.

Plaintiff: Wagner Equipment CO.
Defendant: FedEx Freight, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2013cv01170
Filed: May 2, 2013
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Arapahoe
Presiding Judge: Marcia S. Krieger
Referring Judge: Kathleen M. Tafoya
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 49:14706 Carmack Amendment to the Interstate Commerce Act
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 3, 2013 10 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER Resetting Scheduling Conference for 8/15/2013 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 7/3/13. (sgrim)
August 16, 2013 14 Opinion or Order of the Court TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER - CIVIL by Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 8/16/13. (msksec, )
July 14, 2014 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER of Dismissal by Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 7/14/14. (dkals, )
May 14, 2013 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference. Scheduling Conference set for 8/6/2013 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. The parties shall submit their proposed scheduling order on or before 7/30/13, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 5/14/13. (sgrim)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wagner Equipment CO. v. FedEx Freight, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wagner Equipment CO.
Represented By: James Gordon Gaspich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FedEx Freight, Inc.
Represented By: Bruce Alford Menk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.