Purzel Video GmbH v. Does 156, 157, 160, 161, 162, 163, 164, 165, 168, 169, 170, 171, 175, 176, 177, 181, 182, 183, 188, 190, 191, 192, 193, 197 and 199

Plaintiff: Purzel Video GmbH
Defendant: Does 156, 157, 160, 161, 162, 163, 164, 165, 168, 169, 170, 171, 175, 176, 177, 181, 182, 183, 188, 190, 191, 192, 193, 197 and 199
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv01173
Filed: May 2, 2013
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: XX Outside US
Presiding Judge: Wiley Y. Daniel
Referring Judge: Michael E. Hegarty
 
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
May 7, 2013 11 Featured Case ORDER granting in part and denying in part 4 Plaintiff's Motion and Memorandum for Leave to Take Discovery Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 5/7/2013. (mehcd)
July 18, 2013 17 Featured Case ORDER. ORDERED that Defendant Doe Nos. 163 and 165 are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, and shall hereafter be taken off the caption by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 07/18/13. (jjhsl, )
August 6, 2013 19 Featured Case ORDER. ORDERED that Defendant Doe Nos. 164 and 199 are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Defendant Do No. 191 is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 08/06/13. (jjhsl, )
September 17, 2013 37 Featured Case ORDER. ORDERED that Defendants Lucas Petsche, Bryce Janssen, Russell Fontaine, Mitchell Hassler, and Alex Burke are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE, and shall hereafter be taken off the caption by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 09/17/13. (jjhsl, )
November 12, 2013 58 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice 55 Plaintiff's Motion and Memorandum for Default Judgment against Defendant Derrick Anderson, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 11/12/2013. (mehcd)
January 6, 2014 63 Featured Case ORDER Affirming and Adopting Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge. ORDERED that the Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge 62 is AFFIRMED and ADOPTED. ORDERED that Plaintiffs Amended Motion and Memorandum for Default Judgment Against Defendant Derrick Anderson (ECF No. 59) is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall enter judgment in Plaintiff's favor against Defendant Derrick Anderson by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 01/06/14.(jjhsl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Purzel Video GmbH v. Does 156, 157, 160, 161, 162, 163, 164, 165, 168, 169, 170, 171, 175, 176, 177, 181, 182, 183, 188, 190, 191, 192, 193, 197 and 199
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Purzel Video GmbH
Represented By: Paul Alan Lesko
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 156, 157, 160, 161, 162, 163, 164, 165, 168, 169, 170, 171, 175, 176, 177, 181, 182, 183, 188, 190, 191, 192, 193, 197 and 199
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]