Weitz Company, LLC, The et al v. Capitol Peak Lodge Condominium Association, Inc.

Plaintiff: Base Village Owner, LLC, LaFarge West, Inc., Baker Concrete Construction, Inc. and Weitz Company, LLC, The
Defendant: Capitol Peak Lodge Condominium Association, Inc.
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv01179
Filed: May 3, 2013
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Robert E. Blackburn
Referring Judge: Michael J. Watanabe
 
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
May 29, 2013 11 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER granting 6 Unopposed Motion for Leave to file Amended Complaint Under Restricted Access Pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 7.2. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 5/29/2013.(klyon, )
August 9, 2013 42 Featured Case TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE ORDER: Proposed Pretrial Order due by 3/28/2014. Final Pretrial Conference and Trial Preparation Conference are set for 4/4/2014 02:30 PM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. Two (2) day Bench Trial set for 4/7/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 8/9/13. (rebsec, )
November 22, 2013 49 Featured Case ORDER adopting 47 Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge. by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 11/22/2013. Defendant's Motion To Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) [# 22 ] is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED AS MOOT IN PART. Judgm ent without prejudice SHALL ENTER on behalf of defendant,Capitol Peak Lodge Condominium Association, Inc., a Colorado nonprofit corporation, against plaintiffs, The Weitz Company, LLC, an Iowa limited liability company; Baker Concrete Construction, I nc., an Ohio corporation; LaFarge West, Inc., a Delaware corporation; and Base Village Owner, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company, jointly and severally, on all claims for relief and causes of action. All pretrial deadlines, the Trial Preparation Conference set 4/4/2014, at 2:30 p.m., and the bench trial set 4/7/2014, are VACATED. Defendant is AWARDED its costs, to be taxed by the clerk of the court. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn. (klyon, )
November 22, 2013 50 Featured Case JUDGMENT by Clerk in favor of Capitol Peak Lodge Condominium Association, Inc. against Baker Concrete Construction, Inc., Base Village Owner, LLC, LaFarge West, Inc., Weitz Company, LLC, The re: 49 Order, by Clerk on 11/22/2013. (klyon, )
May 7, 2013 5 Featured Case ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 6/26/2013 09:30 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 5/7/2013. (mjwcd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Weitz Company, LLC, The et al v. Capitol Peak Lodge Condominium Association, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Base Village Owner, LLC
Represented By: John Patrick Box, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LaFarge West, Inc.
Represented By: John Patrick Box, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Baker Concrete Construction, Inc.
Represented By: John Patrick Box, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Weitz Company, LLC, The
Represented By: John Patrick Box, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capitol Peak Lodge Condominium Association, Inc.
Represented By: Peter W. Thomas, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]