Scherr v. Comcast Cable Communications Management, LLC

Plaintiff: David Scherr
Defendant: Comcast Cable Communications Management, LLC
Case Number: 1:2013cv01189
Filed: May 6, 2013
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: El Paso
Presiding Judge: Wiley Y. Daniel
Referring Judge: Craig B. Shaffer
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 29:623 Job Discrimination
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 2, 2013 16 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 8/2/13. (cbssec)
April 1, 2014 25 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER On March 31, 2014, the parties filed a Notice of Settlement ECF No. 23 indicating that this matter has settled. Accordingly, Defendants motion for summary judgment ECF No. 21 is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE, by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 4/1/2014.(evana, )
May 5, 2014 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE that the Stipulation for Dismissal With Prejudice ECF No. 26 is APPROVED. This case is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, with each party to pay its own attorney fees and costs, by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 5/5/2014. (evana, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scherr v. Comcast Cable Communications Management, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Scherr
Represented By: Tatiana Taylor
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Comcast Cable Communications Management, LLC
Represented By: Darin L. Mackender
Represented By: Danielle S. Urban
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]