Grobecker v. Grundy et al

Defendant: Steve Gustin, Jason Grundy and McNulty
Plaintiff: David Grobecker
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv01190
Filed: May 6, 2013
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Montrose
Presiding Judge: Marcia S. Krieger
Referring Judge: Kristen L. Mix
 
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1983 Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
November 19, 2013 29 Featured Case TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER - CIVIL by Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 11/19/13. (msksec, )
December 9, 2013 33 Featured Case ORDER granting in part and denying in part 30 Unopposed Motion to StayDiscovery. The Motion is granted to the extent that all discovery related to Plaintiff's claims against Defendants in their individual capacities is STAYED pending resolution of the motion to dismiss [#21]. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 12/9/2013. (klyon, )
May 21, 2013 5 Featured Case ORDER setting Scheduling/Planning Conference for 9/4/2013 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom C204 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 5/21/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment 1, # 2 Attachment 2, # 3 Attachment 3) (klyon, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Grobecker v. Grundy et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Gustin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Grundy
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McNulty
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Grobecker
Represented By: Brice A. Tondre
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]