Robinson v. USA

Petitioner: Karl A. Robinson
Respondent: USA
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv01195
Filed: May 6, 2013
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
 
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question: Tort Action
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
May 7, 2013 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Directing Petitioner to Cure Deficiencies, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 5/07/2013. (skl)
June 12, 2013 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER dismissing this action without prejudice, and denying without prejudice leave to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 6/12/13. (dkals, )
June 24, 2013 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 7 Petitioner, Karl A. Robinson's Motion for Reconsideration re 5 Order of Dismisal, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 6/24/2013.(ervsl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Robinson v. USA
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Karl A. Robinson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: USA
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]