Roche v. Lincoln College of Technology et al

Defendant: Sue Kuhl, Allan Short, Lincoln College of Technology and Steven Lasecke
Plaintiff: John Joseph Roche
Case Number: 1:2013cv01204
Filed: May 7, 2013
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Arapahoe
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question: Employment Discrimination
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 10, 2013 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER overruling 12 Objection by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 6/10/13. (dkals, )
June 25, 2013 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the action is dismissed without prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(b) for failure to cure the deficiencies within the time allowed. It is FURTHER ORDERED that leave to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal is denied, by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 6/25/2013. (ervsl, )
June 28, 2013 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO REINSTATE CASE by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 6/28/2013. (ervsl, )
August 15, 2013 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Dismissing Case. ORDERED that the Motion to Withdraw Title VII Action filed on August 7, 2013, 21 , is construed as a Notice of Voluntary Dismissal and is effective as of August 7, 2013, the date Plaintiff filed the Notice in this action, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 8/15/13.(sgrim)
May 8, 2013 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Directing Plaintiff to Cure Deficiency, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 5/08/2013. (skl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roche v. Lincoln College of Technology et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sue Kuhl
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allan Short
Represented By: Nicholas Anthony Murray
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lincoln College of Technology
Represented By: Nicholas Anthony Murray
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Lasecke
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Joseph Roche
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]