Rhodes et al v. Country Mutual Insurance Company

Defendant: Country Mutual Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Silvia Caceres and Ryan Rhodes
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv01215
Filed: May 8, 2013
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: Raymond P. Moore
Referring Judge: Craig B. Shaffer
 
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1446 Breach of Contract- Insurance
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
June 10, 2013 13 Featured Case ORDER setting a Scheduling Conference on 7/8/2013 at 10:45 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer, by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 6/10/13. (cbssec)
October 4, 2013 25 Featured Case STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 10/4/13. (cbssec)
March 31, 2014 43 Featured Case COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer: Motion Hearing held on 3/31/2014. ORDERED: 34 Motion to Strike is DENIED. ORDERED: Any and all other expert disclosures and/or expert discovery shall be STAYED. Within 72 hours of a decision on 29 Motion for Summary Judgment, counsel shall coordinate a conference call with Magistrate Judge Shaffer. ORDERED: The Final Pretrial Conference currently set for 4/24/2014 is VACATED. FTR: Courtroom A402 - C. Covington. (ccovi)
July 9, 2014 47 Featured Case ORDER FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE re 46 Stipulation for Dismissal With Prejudice. Plaintiffs' claims against Defendantare dismissed with prejudice, each party to bear its own fees and costs. By Judge Raymond P. Moore on 7/9/2014. (klyon, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Rhodes et al v. Country Mutual Insurance Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Country Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Jeffrey Alexander Bollers
Represented By: Brendan O'Rourke Powers
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Silvia Caceres
Represented By: Alex Michael Nelson
Represented By: AnnMarie Megill Spain
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan Rhodes
Represented By: AnnMarie Megill Spain
Represented By: Alex Michael Nelson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]