Hamilton v. Collection Bureau, Inc., The

Plaintiff: Collection Bureau, Inc, The and Fletcher Hamilton
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv01221
Filed: May 8, 2013
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Arapahoe
Presiding Judge: Marcia S. Krieger
Referring Judge: Kristen L. Mix
 
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
August 28, 2013 14 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER granting 12 Unopposed Motion For Leave For Plaintiff's Counsel to Appear at the Scheduling Conference by Telephone. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 8/28/13.(mnfsl, )
September 4, 2013 15 Featured Case CIVIL TRIAL PROCEDURES ORDER. Final Pretrial Conference/Trial Preparation Conference set for 4/30/2014 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom C204 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 4/23/2014. Jury Trial set for 5/19/2014 and 5/20/2014 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom C204 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 9/4/13. (mnfsl, )
May 22, 2013 6 Featured Case ORDER setting Scheduling/Planning Conference for 9/4/2013 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom C204 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 5/22/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment 1, # 2 Attachment 2, # 3 Attachment 3) (klyon, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Hamilton v. Collection Bureau, Inc., The
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Collection Bureau, Inc, The
Represented By: Jan O. Westman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fletcher Hamilton
Represented By: David Michael Larson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]