Karcher North America, Inc. v. Nilfisk-Advance, Inc.

Plaintiff: Karcher North America, Inc.
Defendant: Nilfisk-Advance, Inc.
Counter_claimant: Nilfisk-Advance, Inc.
Counter_defendant: Karcher North America, Inc.
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv01284
Filed: May 16, 2013
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Arapahoe
Presiding Judge: Christine M. Arguello
Referring Judge: Michael J. Watanabe
 
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:0001 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
April 4, 2014 103 Featured Case ORDER granting 55 Motion to Stay Litigation by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 4/4/14.(dkals, )
August 6, 2013 25 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER granting 23 Joint Motion for Entry of Stipulated Protective Order by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 8/6/13.(dkals, )
August 6, 2013 26 Featured Case PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 8/6/13. (dkals, )
August 7, 2013 29 Featured Case ORDER granting 27 Joint Motion for Entry Regarding E-Discovery Order by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 8/7/13.(dkals, )
September 25, 2013 47 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER granting 41 Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 9/25/13.(dkals, )
May 22, 2013 8 Featured Case ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 8/12/2013 03:00 PM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 5/22/2013. (mjwcd)
February 3, 2014 99 Featured Case ORDER granting 97 Joint Motion for Clarification Regarding Claim Construction Briefing Deadlines. Scheduling Order 32 is amended accordingly. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 2/3/2014.(mjwcd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Karcher North America, Inc. v. Nilfisk-Advance, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karcher North America, Inc.
Represented By: Robert R. Brunelli
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nilfisk-Advance, Inc.
Represented By: David Alan Allgeyer
Represented By: Patrick Compton
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Nilfisk-Advance, Inc.
Represented By: David Alan Allgeyer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Karcher North America, Inc.
Represented By: Robert R. Brunelli
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]