Killer Joe Nevada, LLC v. John Does 1-17

Plaintiff: Killer Joe Nevada, LLC
Defendant: John Does 1-17
Case Number: 1:2013cv01292
Filed: May 17, 2013
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Wiley Y. Daniel
Referring Judge: Michael E. Hegarty
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 21, 2013 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 10 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Take Limited Expedited Discovery Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 5/21/2013. (mehcd)
July 22, 2013 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Entering Stipulated Consent Decree and Dismissal With Prejudice of Doe No. 16 (Lorry Lambert). Order granting 14 Motion to Amend Complaint Naming Doe No. 16 and for an Order Entering Consent Decree and Dismissal with Prejudice. Defendant Lorry Lambert, named as Defendant Doe No. 16 in the Complaint, is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, each party to pay its own costs and fees. The caption shall hereafter be amended to reflect the dismissal with prejudice of Defendant Lorry Lambert and Defendant Doe No. 16 from this action by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 07/22/13.(jjhsl, )
July 24, 2013 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. ORDERED that John Does 13 and 17 are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE, and shall hereafter be taken off the caption by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 07/24/13. (jjhsl, )
August 6, 2013 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. ORDERED that John Doe 3 is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, and shall hereafter be taken off the caption by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 08/06/13. (jjhsl, )
August 15, 2013 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. ORDERED that John Doe 14 is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE and John Doe 4 is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 08/15/13. (jjhsl, )
September 5, 2013 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. ORDERED that John Does 5 and 11 are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, and shall hereafter be taken off the caption by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 09/05/13. (jjhsl, )
October 15, 2013 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. ORDERED that John Doe 1 is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, and John Does 2 and 6 are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 10/15/13. (jjhsl, )
November 7, 2013 52 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice 49 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint in Order to Identify Defendant John Doe 10 by Name, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 11/7/2013. (mehcd)
November 12, 2013 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. ORDERED that John Doe 12 is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, and shall hereafter be taken off the caption by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 11/12/13. (jjhsl, )
November 13, 2013 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE In accordance with the Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Action Without Prejudice Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i) filed November 13, 2013 ECF No. 55 , it is ORDERED that this case is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE, by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 11/13/2013. (ervsl, ) (Main Document 56 replaced on 11/13/2013) (ervsl, ). (Modified on 11/13/2013 attached correct PDF)(ervsl, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Killer Joe Nevada, LLC v. John Does 1-17
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Killer Joe Nevada, LLC
Represented By: David John Stephenson, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-17
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]