Neyer v. Rockwell Automation, Inc.

Defendant: Rockwell Automation, Inc.
Plaintiff: Judith A. Neyer
Case Number: 1:2013cv01350
Filed: May 23, 2013
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Broomfield
Presiding Judge: Marcia S. Krieger
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000 Job Discrimination (Age)
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 5, 2013 14 Opinion or Order of the Court TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER - CIVIL by Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 9/5/13. (msksec, )
October 2, 2013 18 Opinion or Order of the Court PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 10/2/13. (sgrim)
May 16, 2014 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 25 Motion to Dismiss with prejudice, by Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 5/16/2014.(trlee, )
July 1, 2013 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 9/4/2013 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 7/1/13. (sgrim)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Neyer v. Rockwell Automation, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rockwell Automation, Inc.
Represented By: Amy L. Miletich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judith A. Neyer
Represented By: Katherine Winnette Beckman
Represented By: Bryan E. Kuhn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.