Concaten, Inc. et al v. Iteris, Inc. et al

Defendant: Iteris, Inc. and Meridian Environmental Technology, Inc.
Plaintiff: IWAPI, Inc. and Concaten, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2013cv01358
Filed: May 24, 2013
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: Raymond P. Moore
Referring Judge: Michael J. Watanabe
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 9:9 Motion to Confirm Arbitration
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 13, 2013 13 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 11 Unopposed Motion to Vacate Scheduling Conference. Scheduling Conference 8/14/2013 09:30 AM is VACATED, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 8/13/2013.(mjwcd)
September 22, 2014 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 1 Motion to confirm final arbitration award, by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 9/22/2014.(trlee, )
May 28, 2013 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 8/14/2013 09:30 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 5/28/2013. (mjwcd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Concaten, Inc. et al v. Iteris, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Iteris, Inc.
Represented By: William Hondlow Short
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meridian Environmental Technology, Inc.
Represented By: William Hondlow Short
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IWAPI, Inc.
Represented By: David Anthony Palladino, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Concaten, Inc.
Represented By: David Anthony Palladino, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]