Ventura, Inc. et al v. Sharkansky LLP et al

Defendant: Richard J. Tobin, Tobin & Associates, P.C., Scott Estabrooks, Sharkansky LLP, Holland & Knight LLP and Richard J. Hindlian
Plaintiff: Triangle River 401 LLC, JJJ Foundation, Inc., Keith Wegen, John R. Butler and Ventura, Inc.
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv01486
Filed: June 10, 2013
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Boulder
Presiding Judge: Philip A. Brimmer
Referring Judge: Kathleen M. Tafoya
 
Nature of Suit: Fraud or Truth-In-Lending
Cause of Action: 15:77 Securities Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
July 10, 2013 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 10/2/2013 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 7/10/13. (sgrim)
August 13, 2013 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF RECUSAL directing assignment to another judge. By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 8/13/13. (mnfsl, )
November 4, 2013 63 Opinion or Order of the Court PROTECTIVE ORDER. by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 11/4/2013. (trlee, )
February 4, 2014 83 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 82 Stipulation for Dismissal With Prejudice. 37 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint WITHDRAWN. by Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 2/4/14.(rbjcd, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Ventura, Inc. et al v. Sharkansky LLP et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard J. Tobin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tobin & Associates, P.C.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Estabrooks
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sharkansky LLP
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Holland & Knight LLP
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard J. Hindlian
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Triangle River 401 LLC
Represented By: William Frederick Jones
Represented By: Eric B. Liebman
Represented By: Dean Elliot Richardson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JJJ Foundation, Inc.
Represented By: William Frederick Jones
Represented By: Eric B. Liebman
Represented By: Dean Elliot Richardson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith Wegen
Represented By: William Frederick Jones
Represented By: Eric B. Liebman
Represented By: Dean Elliot Richardson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John R. Butler
Represented By: Eric B. Liebman
Represented By: William Frederick Jones
Represented By: Dean Elliot Richardson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ventura, Inc.
Represented By: Dean Elliot Richardson
Represented By: Eric B. Liebman
Represented By: William Frederick Jones
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]