Bernstein et al v. Discovery Communications, Inc. et al

Defendant: Discovery Communications, Inc. and Anthropic Productions, Corp.
Plaintiff: Melanie Flannell-Bernstein and Melvin B. Bernstein
Case Number: 1:2013cv01522
Filed: June 13, 2013
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: El Paso
Referring Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Presiding Judge: Wiley Y. Daniel
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Wrongful Death
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 3, 2013 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 35 Motion to Compel. ORDERED that the Fifth and Sixth Causes of Action asserted by Plaintiff Melanie Flanell-Bernstein are submitted to arbitration and STAYED pending the arbitrations outcome. All remaining claims are not stayed. by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 10/3/2103.(trlee, )
October 16, 2013 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 38 Motion to Dismiss Party. Mike Bernstein and Jay Bernstein shall hereafter be taken off the caption. The claims of the remaining Plaintiffs remain pending by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 10/16/13.(jjhsl, )
November 1, 2013 44 Opinion or Order of the Court PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 11/1/13. (bnbcd, )
January 6, 2014 53 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER. Defendant Anthropic Productions Corp.'s Motion for Leave to File Counterclaim and Third Party Complaint 50 , which is unopposed, is GRANTED. Defendant Discovery Communications, LLCs Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Counterclaim Against Plaintiff Mel Bernstein and Third Party Complaint Against Michael Bernstein, Jay Bernstein, Dragon Arms, Inc. and Skull Enterprises, LLC, 51 is GRANTED by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 01/06/13.(jjhsl, )
March 27, 2014 63 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE it is ORDERED that the Stipulation for Dismissal With Prejudice of Complaint and Counterclaims ECF No. 61 is APPROVED. The Complaint and Counterclaims are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, each party to pay his, her or its own cost s and attorney fees. It is FURTHER ORDERED that all third-party claims are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE in accordance with the Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Third-Party Claims filed March 21, 2014 ECF No. 62 , by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 3/27/2014. (evana, )
July 1, 2013 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 9/5/2013 10:30 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland, proposed Scheduling Order due by 8/29/13. by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 7/1/13. (bnbcd, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bernstein et al v. Discovery Communications, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Discovery Communications, Inc.
Represented By: William C. Brittan
Represented By: Margaret R. Pflueger
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthropic Productions, Corp.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melanie Flannell-Bernstein
Represented By: Thomas George Tasker
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melvin B. Bernstein
Represented By: Thomas George Tasker
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]