Microsoft Corporation v. Discount Mountain, Inc. et al

Defendant: Discount Mountain, Inc. and Matt Lockwood
Plaintiff: Microsoft Corporation
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv01699
Filed: June 27, 2013
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Richard P. Matsch
 
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
August 8, 2013 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 10/2/2013 at 11:00 AM in Conference Room, proposed order (original only) on paper, shall be submitted directly to chambers by 4:00 p.m. on September 26, 2013, lead counsel present and no parties permitted. Initial disclosures under Rule 26(a)(1) will be completed no later than 10 calendar days before the scheduling conference, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 8/8/2013. (rpmcd )
October 31, 2013 18 Opinion or Order of the Court Stipulated PROTECTIVE ORDER re 17 , by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 10/31/2013. (rpmcd)
December 3, 2013 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 19 Motion for Leave to File Third-Party Complaint and the Third-Party Complaint attached [19-1] thereto is accepted for filing, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 12/3/2013.(rpmcd)
February 26, 2014 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 39 Motion to Modify 15 Scheduling Order: Contradicting expert reports: May 2, 2014, Rebuttal expert reports: June 2, 2014, Deadline for service of written interrogatories and requests for production ofdocuments: June 2, 2014, Discovery due by 7/3/2014, and Dispositive Motions due by 8/4/2014, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 2/26/2014.(rpmcd)
May 1, 2014 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 50 Motion to Modify re 15 : Contradicting expert reports: May 16, 2014, and Rebuttal expert reports: June 14, 2014, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 5/1/2014. (jsmit)
May 15, 2014 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 52 Motion to Amend re 15 : Contradicting expert reports: June 6, 2014 and Rebuttal expert reports: July 7, 2014, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 5/15/2014.(jsmit)
May 23, 2014 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 54 Motion to Modify re 15 and 40 : Discovery due by 11/30/2014 and Dispositive Motions due by 12/20/2014, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 5/23/2014.(jsmit )
June 18, 2014 60 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 57 Stipulation : defendants Discount Mountain, Inc., a Colorado corporation, and Matt Lockwood, an individual, (collectively "Defendants") along with their directors, principals, officers, agents, servants, employees, represen tatives, successors and assigns, and all those persons or entities acting in concert or participation with them, shall be and hereby are PERMANENTLY ENJOINED and restrained from: (a) distributing Original Equipment Manufacturer name branded reinstall ation or restore discs for Microsoft Windows 7 operating system software paired only with Certificate of Authenticity labels; and, (b) trafficking in stand-alone Microsoft Certificate of Authenticity labels, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 6/18/2014. (jsmit )
June 18, 2014 61 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 58 Stipulation: Defendants Discount Mountain, Inc. and Matt Lockwood are hereby dismissed with prejudice from Plaintiff Microsoft Corporation's Complaint. The above-captioned Complaint, including all claims asserted therein, is dis missed with prejudice pursuant to Rule 41(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, with each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. The claims pending between Discount Mountain and the third party defendants shall remain in the case, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 6/18/2014. (jsmit)
June 18, 2014 62 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 59 Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Third-Party Complaint within three days, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 6/18/2014.(jsmit )
August 27, 2014 67 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 66 : all claims between Third-Party Plaintiff, Discount Mountain, Inc., and Third-Party Defendant, ATL International Corp., in this case are dismissed with prejudice, each party to pay his or its own costs and attorneys fees, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 8/27/2014. (jsmit)
July 8, 2013 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER of Recusal reassigning case to another judge of this court. By Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 7/8/2013. (klyon, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Microsoft Corporation v. Discount Mountain, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Discount Mountain, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas Edward Moore, III
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matt Lockwood
Represented By: Thomas Edward Moore, III
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Microsoft Corporation
Represented By: Katherine Marie Dugdale
Represented By: Michael Alex Sink
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]