Bailey v. City of Englewood et al

Defendant: Michael Pattarozzi, City of Englewood and Martin Semple
Plaintiff: Douglas Bailey
Case Number: 1:2013cv01715
Filed: June 28, 2013
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Arapahoe
Referring Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Presiding Judge: Raymond P. Moore
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12112 American with Disabilities Act (ADA- Discrimination)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 29, 2014 100 Opinion or Order of the Court PROTECTIVE ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 9/29/14. (bsimm, )
December 4, 2014 108 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER setting case for trial: Trial Preparation Conference set for 7/31/2015 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom A 601 before Judge Raymond P. Moore. A five day Jury Trial is set to commence on 8/31/2015 at 9:00 AM before Judge Raymond P. Moore, courtroom A 601. By Judge Raymond P. Moore on 12/4/2014. (tscha, )
February 18, 2014 53 Opinion or Order of the Court COURTROOM MINUTES/ MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 2/18/14. ORDERED: Motion to Dismiss for Failure to Prosecute 42 is DENIED. ORDERED: The Court compels discovery from Plaintiff on or before March 4, 2014. Parties are to confer and propose an amended scheduling order. (Simmons, B.)
February 18, 2014 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 2/18/14. 42 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss for Failure to Prosecute is DENIED. (Simmons, B.)
April 2, 2014 59 Opinion or Order of the Court COURTROOM MINUTES for Status Conference held on 4/2/2014 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland. Plaintiff's Partly Contested Motion to Amend Scheduling Order 55 is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. Discovery due by 8/29/2014. Dispositive Motions due by 9/29/2014. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 11/28/2014. Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/4/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland. FTR: Courtroom A-401. (bsimm)
April 2, 2014 60 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 4/2/14. Plaintiffs Motion to Amend Scheduling Order 55 is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. (bsimm)
April 15, 2014 63 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as moot 21 Motion to Dismiss, by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 4/15/2014.(trlee, )
July 16, 2013 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 9/3/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland, proposed scheduling order due by 8/27/13. by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 7/16/13. (bnbcd, )
May 8, 2014 72 Opinion or Order of the Court COURTROOM MINUTE/MINUTE ORDER for Motions Hearing held on 5/8/2014 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland. ORDERED: Plaintiff's Contested Motion to Amend Second Amended Complaint 62 is TAKEN UNDER ADVISEMENT. Defendant's Motion for Sanctions 65 is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. FTR: Courtroom A-401. (bsimm)
May 8, 2014 73 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 5/8/14 re: defendant's Motion for Sanctions 65 . The Motion for Sanctions is DENIED insofar as it seeks dismissal of the action as a discovery sanction but is GRANTED insofar as it requests an order compelling discovery. (bsimm)
June 16, 2014 79 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 6/16/14. The Motion for Fees 74 is DENIED as moot. (bsimm)
July 11, 2014 82 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting Recommendation Of United States Magistrate Judge (ECF No. 81 ). Plaintiff's Contested Motion to Amend Second Amended Complaint (ECF No. 62 ) is DENIED. By Judge Raymond P. Moore on 7/11/2014.(klyon, )
August 20, 2014 90 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 87 Motion to Amend Scheduling Order, Discovery due by 9/12/2014. Dispositive Motions due by 10/14/2014. By Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 8/20/2014.(trlee, )
August 22, 2014 92 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 8/22/14. IT IS ORDERED that the plaintiff shall submit, on or before August 27, 2014, thedocuments identified in its Motion for Protective Order 83 , in hard copy form and delivered directly to my Chambers, for in camera review. (bsimm, )
September 8, 2014 96 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 9/8/14. The Motion for Protective Order 83 is DENIED; and The plaintiff shall produce unredacted medical records on or before September 16, 2014. (bsimm, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bailey v. City of Englewood et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Pattarozzi
Represented By: Michael Brent Case
Represented By: Holly Eileen Ortiz
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Englewood
Represented By: Michael Brent Case
Represented By: Holly Eileen Ortiz
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martin Semple
Represented By: Michael Brent Case
Represented By: Holly Eileen Ortiz
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas Bailey
Represented By: Lisa Renee Shellenberger
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]