Levy v. Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.

Defendant: Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.
Plaintiff: Michael Levy
Case Number: 1:2013cv01762
Filed: July 3, 2013
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Douglas
Presiding Judge: Christine M. Arguello
Referring Judge: Kristen L. Mix
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 18, 2013 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting Scheduling/Planning Conference for 9/19/2013 10:30 AM in Courtroom C204, before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 7/18/13. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment 1, # 2 Attachment 2, # 3 Attachment 3) (dkals, )
February 18, 2014 20 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice 15 Defendants Motion to Strike Plaintiffs Expert Disclosures, and Brief in Support Thereof, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 2/18/2014.(evana, )
August 27, 2014 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER of Dismissal With Prejudice. Each party to pay his or its own attorney fees and costs. By Judge Christine M. Arguello on 08/27/2014. (athom, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Levy v. Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.
Represented By: Arthur Kittredge Smith, III
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Levy
Represented By: David W. Krivit
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]