Rice, Jr v. Internal Revenue Service

Defendant: Internal Revenue Service
Plaintiff: David K. Rice, Jr
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv01833
Filed: July 11, 2013
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Grand
Presiding Judge: Philip A. Brimmer
 
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7422 IRS: Refund Taxes
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
August 26, 2013 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. This case is dismissed without prejudice pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(b) for plaintiff's failure to prosecute and to obey orders of the Court. By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 8/26/13. (mnfsl, )
August 27, 2013 11 Opinion or Order of the Court FINAL JUDGMENT by Clerk, re: 10 Order. By Clerk on 8/27/13. (mnfsl, )
July 18, 2013 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The Complaint [Docket No. 1 ] shall be restricted at Level One. On or before 5:00 p.m. on Wednesday, 7/24/2013, plaintiff shall indicate whether he waives the protections of Rule 5.2(a) and, if not, plaintiff shallre-file without restrictions a redacted copy of Docket No. 1 that complies with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5.2(a). By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 7/18/2013. (klyon, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Rice, Jr v. Internal Revenue Service
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Internal Revenue Service
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David K. Rice, Jr
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]