Blue Sky Condominiums Homeowners' Associations, Inc. v. Lexington Insurance Company

Defendant: Lexington Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Blue Sky Condominiums Homeowners' Associations, Inc.
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv01858
Filed: July 12, 2013
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Boulder
Referring Judge: Kristen L. Mix
Presiding Judge: Raymond P. Moore
 
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 12:635
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
September 26, 2013 22 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the 20 Expedited Motion to Stay Discovery, Pretrial Proceedings, and Reschedule Date for Scheduling Conference If Necessary is GRANTED in part to the extent that it seeks to preclude discovery prior to the Scheduling Conference. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Motion (# 20 ) is otherwise DENIED without prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall not engage in discovery, other than providing mandatory disclosures, until after the Scheduling Conference on October 9, 2013. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 09/26/13. (alvsl)
January 29, 2014 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 26 Expedited Motion to Stay Discovery and Pretrial Proceedings. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 1/29/2014.(trlee, )
April 2, 2014 41 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 4/2/14 Granting 38 Second Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Serve Responses to Defendant's Request for Production of Documents and Interrogatories and Granting 39 Unopposed Motion to Amend Scheduling Order. Affirmative Expert Disclosure Deadline July 2, 2014. Rebuttal Expert Disclosure Deadline August 4. 2014 Discovery due by 8/15/2014. Dispositive Motions due by 9/2/2014. by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 4/2/14.(lgale)
April 17, 2014 45 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 42 Motion to Amend/Correct/Modify; granting 43 Motion for Extension of Time. Affirmative Expert Disclosure Deadline 7/16/2014. Rebuttal Expert Disclosure Deadline 8/18/2014. Discovery due by 8/29/2014. Dispositive Motions due by 9/15/2014. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 4/17/2014.(trlee, )
May 21, 2014 48 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 5/21/14 Granting Joint Motion for Entry of Protective Order 46 . IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Protective Order [#46-1] supplied by the parties is accepted for filing and entered as an Order of the Court, with interlineations, as of the date of this Minute Order. (lgale)
May 21, 2014 49 Opinion or Order of the Court PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 5/21/14. (lgale)
November 21, 2014 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL CASE. by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 11/21/2014. (tscha, )
July 18, 2013 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting Scheduling/Planning Conference. Scheduling/Planning Conference set for 10/9/2013 10:30 AM in Courtroom C204 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 07/18/13. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment 1, # 2 Attachment 2, # 3 Attachment 3) (alvsl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Blue Sky Condominiums Homeowners' Associations, Inc. v. Lexington Insurance Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lexington Insurance Company
Represented By: Mark D. Sheridan
Represented By: Maxine Sue Anne Martin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Blue Sky Condominiums Homeowners' Associations, Inc.
Represented By: Nelson Andrew Waneka
Represented By: Bradley Aaron Levin
Represented By: Jeremy Andrew Sitcoff
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]