Bellon v. Colvin

Interested_party: SSA Noticing
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Plaintiff: Cheryl A. Bellon
Case Number: 1:2013cv01862
Filed: July 12, 2013
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: El Paso
Presiding Judge: John L. Kane
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:402 Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 15, 2013 16 Opinion or Order of the Court Joint Case Management Plan for Social Security Cases (ORDER). SS Plaintiffs Brief due by 12/5/2013. SS Defendants Brief due by 1/4/2014. SS Plaintiffs Reply Brief due by 1/20/2014. By Judge John L. Kane on 11/15/2013. (klyon, )
April 23, 2014 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Affirming AJL's Decision Denying Disability Benefits, that the ALJs denial of disability benefits is AFFIRMED. It is FURTHER ORDERED that each party shall pay its own costs and attorney fees. By Judge Christine M. Arguello on 04/23/2014. (athom, )
April 25, 2014 26 Opinion or Order of the Court FINAL JUDGMENT. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 4/25/2014. (shart)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bellon v. Colvin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested_party: SSA Noticing
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cheryl A. Bellon
Represented By: Frederick W. Newall
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]