Gonzales v. Colvin

Interested_party: SSA Noticing
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Plaintiff: Sandra Gonzales
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv01864
Filed: July 12, 2013
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Conejos
Presiding Judge: John L. Kane
 
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:205 Denial Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
October 7, 2013 12 Opinion or Order of the Court JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN FOR SOCIAL SECURITY CASES: Plaintiffs Brief due by 11/18/2013. Defendants Brief due by 12/18/2013. Plaintiff Reply Brief due by 1/2/2014. by Judge John L. Kane on 10/7/2013. (trlee, )
September 22, 2014 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REVERSING DISABILITY DECISION AND REMANDING TO COMMISSIONER. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 9/22/2014. (alowe)
September 23, 2014 19 Opinion or Order of the Court FINAL JUDGMENT by Clerk re: 18 Order Reversing Disability Decision and Remanding to Commissioner. By Clerk on 9/23/2014. (alowe)
October 7, 2014 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 22 Stipulated Motion for Attorney Fees. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 10/7/2014.(alowe)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Gonzales v. Colvin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested_party: SSA Noticing
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Gonzales
Represented By: Ann J. Atkinson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]