Petekeiwicz v. Castle Rock, Town of et al

Defendant: Troy Stembel, Town of Castle Rock, Terry Watts, Jack Cauley, Jack (I) Cauley, Troy (I) Stembel and Terry (I) Watts
Plaintiff: Theresa Petekeiwicz
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv01865
Filed: July 13, 2013
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Referring Judge: Kristen L. Mix
Presiding Judge: Raymond P. Moore
 
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1983 Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
July 31, 2013 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting Scheduling/Planning Conference. Scheduling/Planning Conference set for 11/6/2013 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom C204 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 07/31/13. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment 1, # 2 Attachment 2, # 3 Attachment 3) (alvsl)
December 16, 2013 21 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 19 Motion for Protective Order. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the Stipulation and Protective order [#19-1] supplied by the parties is accepted for filing and entered as an Order of the Court, with interlineations, as of the date of this Minute Order by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 12/16/13.(lag)
December 16, 2013 22 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 12/16/13. (lag)
February 18, 2014 28 Opinion or Order of the Court Plaintiff's Amendment to 17 Civil Scheduling Order Computation of Damages by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 2/18/14. (lag)
May 30, 2014 32 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 5/30/14.Unopposed Motion to Amend the Scheduling Order to Extend the Dispositive Motion Deadline [#30] is GRANTED. Dispositive Motions due by 6/13/2014.(lgale)
August 20, 2014 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Jury Trial set for 6/15/2015 at 8:30 AM in Courtroom A 601 before Judge Raymond P. Moore. Trial Preparation Conference set for 5/15/2015 at 01:30 PM before Judge Raymond P. Moore. Entered by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 8/20/2014. (cpear)
September 4, 2014 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: 50 Stipulation, filed by Troy (I) Stembel, Jack (I) Cauley, Town of Castle Rock, Jack Cauley, Terry Watts, Terry (I) Watts, Troy Stembel. There being no further claims against Defendant Cauley, he is dismissed from this action with prejudice and his name shall be removed from the caption in all future filings with the Court, by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 9/4/2014. (trlee, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Petekeiwicz v. Castle Rock, Town of et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Troy Stembel
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Town of Castle Rock
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terry Watts
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jack Cauley
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jack (I) Cauley
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Troy (I) Stembel
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terry (I) Watts
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theresa Petekeiwicz
Represented By: Natacha Maria Gutierrez
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]