Rivera v. Littleton Housing Authority

Defendant: Littleton Housing Authority
Plaintiff: Fernanda Rivera
Case Number: 1:2013cv01949
Filed: July 22, 2013
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 28:1983 Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 3, 2014 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 2/6/2014 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 1/3/14. (sgrim)
March 4, 2014 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 41 Unopposed Motion to Stay Discovery. Discovery in this case is stayed pending ruling on the Motion to Dismiss, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 3/4/2014. (eseam)
June 4, 2014 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. The Motion to Dismiss 17 is DENIED. It is further ORDERED that the stay in this matter is LIFTED. A Scheduling Conference will be held on June 18, 2014, at 9:30 a.m. in Courtroom C-201, Second Floor, of the Byron Rogers U.S. Courthouse, 1929 Stout Street, Denver, Colorado. The parties shall file a proposed amended Scheduling Order no later than June 11, 2014. The Motion to Modify Civil Scheduling Order 44 is GRANTED. New deadlines will be set at the Scheduling Conference, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 6/4/14.(sgrim)
June 18, 2014 49 Opinion or Order of the Court TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 6/18/14. (sgrim)
July 30, 2013 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Directing Plaintiff to Cure Deficiencies, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 07/30/13. (nmmsl, )
August 18, 2014 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 51 Unopposed Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice. Each party to bear its own fees and costs, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 8/18/14.(sgrim)
August 6, 2013 6 Opinion or Order of the Court SECOND ORDER Directing Plaintiff To Cure Deficiencies, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 08/06/13. (nmmsl, )
September 18, 2013 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Drawing Case. This case shall be drawn to a district judge and to a magistrate judge, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 09/18/13. (nmmsl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rivera v. Littleton Housing Authority
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Littleton Housing Authority
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fernanda Rivera
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]