Garcia v. Colvin

Interested_party: SSA Noticing
Plaintiff: Steven S. Garcia
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Case Number: 1:2013cv01958
Filed: July 23, 2013
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Pueblo
Presiding Judge: John L. Kane
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 6, 2013 12 Opinion or Order of the Court JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN FOR SOCIAL SECURITY CASES (ORDER). SS Plaintiffs Brief due by 1/13/2014. SS Defendants Brief due by 2/12/2014. SS Plaintiffs Reply Brief due by 2/27/2014. By Judge John L. Kane on 12/6/13. (mnfsl, )
March 11, 2014 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 16 Motion to Remand. By Judge John L. Kane on 3/11/2014.(klyon, )
March 11, 2014 18 Opinion or Order of the Court Final JUDGMENT by Clerk re: 17 Order on Motion to Remand by Clerk on 3/11/2014. (klyon, )
April 3, 2014 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 19 Motion for Attorney Fees, by Judge John L. Kane on 4/3/2014.(trlee, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garcia v. Colvin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested_party: SSA Noticing
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven S. Garcia
Represented By: Kenneth J. Shakeshaft
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]