A Just Cause v. Martinez

Defendant: United States of America and Darlene M. Martinez
Plaintiff: A Just Cause
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv02260
Filed: August 22, 2013
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: El Paso
Presiding Judge: R. Brooke Jackson
 
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 12:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
January 13, 2014 28 Featured Case ORDER SETTING TRIAL AND TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE: This matter has been scheduled for a three day jury trial on the docket of Judge R. Brooke Jackson in the U.S. District Courthouse, Courtroom A902, 9th Floor, 901 19th Street, Denver, Colorado, to commence on January 26, 2015 at 9:00 a.m. A Trial Preparation Conference is set for January 9, 2015 at 1:00 p.m. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 01/13/2014. (rbjsec. )
August 26, 2013 8 Featured Case ORDER re: 7 United States' Notice of Substitution of the United States for defendant Darlene M. Martinez. It is ORDERED that pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 2679 (d)(l), as amended, the United States shall be and hereby is substituted as the sole defendant herein with respect to plaintiff's common law tort action, and it is further ORDERED that the Complaint shall be and hereby is dismissed with prejudice as to the defendant Darlene M. Martinez to the extent she has been sued for common law torts, and it is further ORDERED that the caption of plaintiff's Complaint shall read as shown. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 08/26/13. (alvsl)
August 27, 2013 9 Featured Case ORDER TO SET SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: The parties are ordered to set an initial scheduling conference in this Court (with Judge Jackson) pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.1 no later than 45 days after the answer, motion to dismiss or other response to the complaint is filed. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 08/27/2013. (rbjsec. )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: A Just Cause v. Martinez
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Michael Conrad Johnson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darlene M. Martinez
Represented By: Michael Conrad Johnson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A Just Cause
Represented By: Cornell Johnson
Represented By: Mark John Geragos
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]