Creekside Townhomes Owners Association v. American Family Mutual Insurance Company

Defendant: American Family Mutual Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Creekside Townhomes Owners Association, Inc.
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv02491
Filed: September 12, 2013
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Douglas
Presiding Judge: Richard P. Matsch
 
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
December 23, 2013 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 16 : Setting Scheduling Conference for 1/21/2014 at 02:00 PM in Conference Room and lead counsel present in person, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 12/23/2013. (rpmcd )
September 25, 2014 25 Opinion or Order of the Court Courtroom Minutes for Motions Hearing held on 9/25/2014 before Judge Richard P. Matsch. ORDERED: Scheduling Conference set October 10, 2014 at 2:00 p.m. Counsel to prepare and submit a proposed scheduling order prior to the conference. Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Appraisal 20 , is moot. Plaintiff's Motion to Strike 21 Defendant's Response to Plaintiff's Motion toCompel Appraisal 22 , is denied. FTR: K. Terasaki. (jsmit)
September 25, 2014 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 10/10/2014 at 02:00 PM in Conference Room, lead counsel present in person, and counsel shall submit the proposed scheduling order in paper form directly to chambers on or before October 9, 2014, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 9/25/2014. (jsmit)
October 10, 2014 29 Opinion or Order of the Court Courtroom Minutes for Scheduling Conference held on 10/10/2014 before Judge Richard P. Matsch. ORDERED: Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend the Complaint 27 : ruling deferred until trial, punitive damages to be determine by the jury if applicable and no additional discovery on this claim. Four day jury trial set May 4, 2015. Pretrial conference set April 17, 2015 at 2:00 p.m. FTR: K. Terasaki. (jsmit)
October 10, 2014 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting Pretrial Conference for 4/17/2015 at 02:00 PM in Conference Room, Proposed Pretrial Order due by 4/9/2015, in paper form directly to chambers by 4:00 p.m., lead counsel present in person. and Jury Trial set for 5/4/2015 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom A, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 10/10/2014. (jsmit )
September 25, 2013 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 11/15/2013 at 02:30 PM in Conference Room, proposed order (original only) on paper, shall be submitted directly to chambers by 4:00 p.m. on November 15, 2013, and lead counsel present in person, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 9/25/2013. (rpmcd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Creekside Townhomes Owners Association v. American Family Mutual Insurance Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Family Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Clifton J. Latiolais, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Creekside Townhomes Owners Association, Inc.
Represented By: Robert William Loree
Represented By: Michael Graves Brownlee
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]