Dalton v. Millice et al

Plaintiff: Keith Dalton
Defendant: Carl Ted Millice, III and Cherry Creek Club, LLC
Case Number: 1:2013cv02596
Filed: September 23, 2013
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Boulder
Referring Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Presiding Judge: Philip A. Brimmer
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 10, 2014 20 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 16 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint. The Clerk of the Court is directed to accept for filing the attached Amended Complaint and Demand for Trial by Jury. By Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 2/10/14.(mfiel, )
April 10, 2014 24 Opinion or Order of the Court PROTECTIVE ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 4/10/14. (bsimm)
March 12, 2015 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 3/12/15. ORDERED: Defendants Millice Enterprises, LLLP and Cherry Creek Club, LLC's Motion for Summary Judgment [Docket No. 28] is GRANTED. ORDERED: Plaintiff's first, second, third, fourth claims for relief are dismissed with prejudice. ORDERED: Within 14 days of the entry of judgment, defendant may have its costs by filing a bill of costs with the Clerk of the Court. ORDERED: This case is dismissed in its entirety. (kpreu)
October 30, 2013 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 12/16/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland, proposed scheduling order due by 12/9/13. by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 10/30/13. (bnbcd, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dalton v. Millice et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith Dalton
Represented By: David H. Wollins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carl Ted Millice, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cherry Creek Club, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.