Chafin v. Stasi et al

Defendant: Michael, Kelli Jaycox, Nicholas Stasi and City of Durango, The
Plaintiff: Daniele Chafin
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv02661
Filed: October 1, 2013
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: La Plata
Presiding Judge: Wiley Y. Daniel
Referring Judge: Michael E. Hegarty
 
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
September 16, 2014 102 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Plaintiffs Motion for Oral Argument on Outstanding Objections to Order to Stay Discovery ECF No. 91 is DENIED. It is FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs Objections to U.S. Magistrate Judge Order on Motion to Stay Discovery ECF No. 87 a re OVERRULED. It is FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs Motion to Extend Date to File Response to Motion for Summary Judgment with Affidavit ECF No. 82 is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. I will grant Plaintiff an extension of time to respond to Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment, but deny his motion to the extent it requests an extension to take discovery. Plaintiff shall file a response to Defendants motion by Friday, September 26, 2014, that conforms with Section III.B of my Practice Standards. In light of this, it is ORDERED that Plaintiffs Renewed Motion to Extend Date to File Response to Motion for Summary Judgment ECF No. 75 is DENIED AS MOOT, by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 9/16/2014.(evana, )
January 30, 2014 29 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER denying as moot 19 Motion to Dismiss by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 01/30/14.(jhawk, )
January 30, 2014 30 Opinion or Order of the Court Stipulation and PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 01/30/14. (jhawk, )
February 11, 2014 36 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 34 Plaintiff's Motion for Conference on Discovery Dispute. Discovery Dispute Hearing set for 3/6/2014 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 2/11/2014. (mehcd)
March 4, 2014 41 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER denying as moot 39 Plaintiff's Notice of "Exhibits to Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint." This was erroneously filed as a motion. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 3/4/2014. (mehcd)
March 6, 2014 43 Opinion or Order of the Court COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty: Telephonic Discovery Hearing held on 3/6/2014. Counsel to file a joint motion with the Court in La Plata County requesting the documents from Plaintiff 's sealed criminal file. 37 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint is granted. The Clerk of the Court is directed to file the [37-1] Second Amended Complaint as of this date. FTR: C. Pearson -- Courtroom A-501. (mehcd)
March 10, 2014 45 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER Denying as moot 28 Defendants Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(b)(6), In light of the filing of the Second Amended Complaint on March 7, 2014 ECF No. 44 , by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 3/10/2014.(evana, )
April 25, 2014 49 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting in part and denying in part 47 Plaintiff's Motion for Conference #2 on Discovery Disputes. Counsel for the partiess shall appear before the Court for a conference regarding the matter on 5/6/2014 at 10:15 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 4/25/2014. (cpear)
May 20, 2014 54 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 52 Plaintiff's Motion for Conference #3 on Discovery Disputes. Discovery Hearing set for 5/21/2014 at 10:15 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 5/20/2014. (cpear)
May 29, 2014 63 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER denying 61 Plaintiff's Motion for Conference #4 on Discovery Disputes, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 5/29/2014. (cpear)
June 2, 2014 68 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting in part and denying in part 66 Plaintiffs Motion for Conference #5 on Discovery Disputes. The Court construes the motion as a request for a hearing on Defendants pending motion to stay and will grant such request. According ly, counsel for the parties are directed to appear before the Court for a hearing regarding Defendants Motion to Stay Discovery docket # 59 on Tuesday, June 17, 2014, at 11:00 a.m. in Courtroom A501 on the fifth floor of the Alfred A. Arraj United States Courthouse, 901 19th Street, Denver, Colorado, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 6/2/2014.(evana, )
June 17, 2014 77 Opinion or Order of the Court COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty: Motion Hearing held on 6/17/2014, taking under advisement 59 Defendants' Motion to Stay Discovery. Defendants may file a written reply in support of their motion by close of business on 6/19/2014. FTR: C. Pearson -- Courtroom A-501. (cpear)
June 25, 2014 85 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 59 Motion to Stay Discovery, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 6/25/2014. (cpear)
July 3, 2014 86 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER denying as moot 83 Motion for Leave, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 7/3/2014.(trlee, )
September 3, 2014 98 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER Plaintiffs Motion for Summary Judgment ECF No. 95 and Statement of Material Facts ECF No. 96 , filed erroneously in CM/ECF as a motion for summary judgment) are STRICKEN with leave to refile. Per Section III.B of my Practice Standards, the Movants Statement of Material Facts must be included in the summary judgment motion. It may not be filed in a separate document. Plaintiffs Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Motion for Summary Judgment of Up to 20 Pages ECF No. 94 is GRANTED, by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 9/3/2014.(evana, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Chafin v. Stasi et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelli Jaycox
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicholas Stasi
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Durango, The
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniele Chafin
Represented By: J. Michael Considine, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]