Kelly v. Raemisch et al

Respondent: Frances Falk, Rick Raemisch and John Suthers
Petitioner: Troy Jamison Kelly
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv02927
Filed: October 25, 2013
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Lincoln
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
 
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
June 4, 2014 20 Featured Case ORDER For State Court Record. By Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 6/4/2014. (klyon, )
June 4, 2014 22 Featured Case ORDER Drawing Case. This case shall be drawn to a presiding judge and, if appropriate, to a magistrate judge. By Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 6/4/2014. (klyon, )
October 29, 2013 3 Featured Case ORDER to File Pre-Answer Response, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 10/29/2013. (skl)
August 12, 2014 41 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER granting 39 petitioner's Motion for Leave to File Applicant's Reply to Respondent's Answer Out of Time. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 8/12/2014.(emill)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Kelly v. Raemisch et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Frances Falk
Represented By: John D. Seidel
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Rick Raemisch
Represented By: John D. Seidel
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: John Suthers
Represented By: John D. Seidel
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Troy Jamison Kelly
Represented By: Richard A. Hostetler
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]