Ward v. Colvin

Interested_party: SSA Noticing
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Plaintiff: Kim Benefield Ward
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv03029
Filed: November 6, 2013
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Pueblo
Presiding Judge: John L. Kane
 
Nature of Suit: Disability Insurance
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
April 15, 2014 11 Featured Case Joint Case Management Plan for Social Security Cases. SS Plaintiffs Brief due by 5/27/2014. SS Defendants Brief due by 6/27/2014. SS Plaintiffs Reply Brief due by 7/11/2014 by Judge John L. Kane on 04/15/14. (jhawk, )
June 24, 2014 14 Featured Case ORDER granting 13 Motion to Remand. This civil action is remanded to Defendant for additional administrative proceedings pursuant to sentence four of 42 U.S.C. § 405(g). The Clerk is directed to enter a judgment in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 58, consistent with the United States Supreme Court's decision in Shalala v. Schaefer, 509 U.S. 292, 296-302 (1993) by Judge John L. Kane on 06/24/14.(jhawk, )
June 25, 2014 15 Featured Case Final Judgment. Final judgment is hereby entered in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 58, consistent with the United States Supreme Court's decision in Shalala v. Schaefer, 509 U.S. 292, 296-302 (1993). Plaintiff may have her costs upon the filing of a Bill of Costs within fourteen days of entry of judgment pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 54(d)(1) and D.C.COLO.LCivR 54.1 by Clerk on 06/25/14. (jhawk, )
August 19, 2014 17 Featured Case ORDER granting 16 Motion for Attorney Fees. ORDERED that the Defendant pay to Plaintiff, through counsel, reasonable attorney fees and expenses in the amount of $5,200.00 by Judge John L. Kane on 08/19/14.(jhawk, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Ward v. Colvin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested_party: SSA Noticing
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kim Benefield Ward
Represented By: Karl E. Osterhout
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]