USA v. Crilley

Petitioner: USA
Respondent: David W. Crilley
Case Number: 1:2013cv03042
Filed: November 7, 2013
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: Wiley Y. Daniel
Referring Judge: Michael E. Hegarty
Nature of Suit: Taxes (US Plaintiff or Defendant)
Cause of Action: 26:6334
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 25, 2014 18 Opinion or Order of the Court Special ORDER of Reference to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya, is designated to conduct proceedings in this civil action as follows:(X) Conduct a settlement conference or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding, by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 2/25/2014. (evana, )
February 26, 2014 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting Settlement Conference for 3/26/2014 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 2/26/14. (sgrim)
March 19, 2014 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 24 the United States' Motion for Voluntary Dismissal of Petition WITHOUT PREJUDICE. All matters currently scheduled are VACATED. It is FURTHER ORDERED that each party shall bear its own costs and attorney's fees, by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 3/19/2014.(evana, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. Crilley
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: USA
Represented By: Colin C. Sampson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: David W. Crilley
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]