Hindorff v. USA

Plaintiff: John D. Hindorff
Defendant: USA
Case Number: 1:2013cv03128
Filed: November 18, 2013
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Boulder
Presiding Judge: Philip A. Brimmer
Referring Judge: Kristen L. Mix
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 21, 2014 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE AND ADVISEMENT TO PRO SE PLAINTIFFS by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 2/21/14. Scheduling Conference set for 4/21/2014 11:00 AM in Courtroom C204 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment 1, # 2 Attachment 2, # 3 Attachment 3, # 4 Attachment 4) (lag, )
August 26, 2014 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 20 Motion for Settlement Conference by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 08/26/14.(jhawk, )
February 26, 2015 36 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 2/26/15. Unopposed Motion to Vacate Pretrial Conference # 34 is GRANTED. Dismissal Paper due by 3/9/2015. (lgale, ) Modified on 2/26/2015 to move the # sign outside of the bracket to create linkage (lgale, ).
March 3, 2015 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITH PREJUDICE. ORDERED that, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a), this matter, and all claims asserted therein, is dismissed with prejudice, with each party to bear its own attorneys' fees and costs by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 03/03/15. (jhawk, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hindorff v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John D. Hindorff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.