Miller et al v. American Family Mutual Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Michael Miller and Diane Miller
Defendant: American Family Mutual Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2014cv00351
Filed: February 7, 2014
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: R. Brooke Jackson
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 2, 2014 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING TRIAL AND TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE: This matter has been scheduled for a five day jury trial on the docket of Judge R. Brooke Jackson in the U.S. District Courthouse, Courtroom A902, 9th Floor, 901 19th Street, Denver, Colorado, to commence on May 4, 2015 at 9:00 a.m. A Trial Preparation Conference is set for April 17, 2015 at 1:30 p.m. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 05/02/2014. (rbjsec. )
May 8, 2015 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The Court finds that:1. If the earth movement that damaged the Millers' foundation was caused solely by the fire and associated fire-fighting efforts, the damage is covered by their policy with American Family. 2. If, however, the eart h movement was caused in part by natural causes unrelated to the fire and in part by the fire and associated fire-fighting efforts, no portion of the damage is covered by the policy. Defendant's Rule 50 motion is denied, and the Court's previous order granting that motion in part is vacated to the extent inconsistent with the present order. The Court's tendered instruction No. 10-A must be revised to be consistent with this order. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 5/8/2015. (tscha, )
February 13, 2014 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SET SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: The parties are ordered to set an initial scheduling conference in this Court (with Judge Jackson) pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.1 no later than 45 days after the answer, motion to dismiss or other response to the complaint is filed. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 02/13/2014. (rbjsec. )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miller et al v. American Family Mutual Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Miller
Represented By: David Jeffrey Furtado
Represented By: Donna DeVaney Stockham(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diane Miller
Represented By: David Jeffrey Furtado
Represented By: Donna DeVaney Stockham(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Family Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Colin C. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.