Sanchez v. Booth et al

Plaintiff: Feliberto Sanchez
Defendant: Dave Booth, Robin Burkett, Timmarie D. Ballard and Werth
Case Number: 1:2014cv02113
Filed: July 30, 2014
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Logan
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 10, 2014 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 13 Motion to correct corrupt (illegal) ruling, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 11/10/2014.(tscha, )
December 22, 2014 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 18 Motion for Recusal. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 12/22/2014.(tscha, )
March 30, 2015 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 21 "Motion to Appeal Courts illegal and Wrongful Decision Under 28 U.S.C. 2201 and 2202 And under rule 65 Fed. R. Crim. P." by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 3/30/15.(dkals, )
August 7, 2014 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Directing Plaintiff to Cure Deficiency, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 8/07/2014. (slibi, )
August 28, 2014 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Directing Plaintiff to File Amended Complaint, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 8/28/14. (morti, )
October 9, 2014 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER to Dismiss in Part and to Draw in Part by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 10/9/14. Defendants Tammarie D Ballard and David Booth are dismissed, and Plaintiff's request for appointed counsel 7 is denied. (dkals, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sanchez v. Booth et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Feliberto Sanchez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dave Booth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robin Burkett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timmarie D. Ballard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Werth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]