Malibu Media, LLC v. John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 67.162.135.229

Plaintiff: Malibu Media, LLC
Defendant: John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 67.162.135.229
Case Number: 1:2014cv02310
Filed: August 20, 2014
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Wiley Y. Daniel
Referring Judge: Michael E. Hegarty
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 25, 2014 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 7 Plaintiffs Motion for Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 8/25/2014.(evana, )
March 24, 2015 27 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice 17 Plaintiffs Motion for Entry of an Order Requiring Defendant to Show Cause Why Final Judgment Should Not be Entered Against Him, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 3/24/2015.(evana, )
April 21, 2015 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE In accordance with Plaintiffs Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice of Erik Mahlum filed pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41( a)(1)(A)(i) on April 20, 2015 ECF No. 35 , it is ORDERED that Defendant Erik Mahlum and this action are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE, by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 4/21/2015. (evana, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Malibu Media, LLC v. John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 67.162.135.229
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Malibu Media, LLC
Represented By: Jason Aaron Kotzker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 67.162.135.229
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.