Workalemahu v. Heritage Club

Plaintiff: Medeset Workalemahu
Defendant: Heritage Club
Case Number: 1:2014cv02396
Filed: August 28, 2014
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Arapahoe
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 2, 2014 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting Service by United States Marshal, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 10/02/2014. (slibi, )
December 9, 2014 29 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 22 Unopposed Motion to Vacate Scheduling Conference. The Scheduling Conference currently set in this case for 12/16/2014 is vacated and the proceedings of this case are temporarily stayed pending resolution of the Defendant's 14 Motion to Compel Arbitration, to which the Plaintiff did not respond. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 12/9/2014. (alowe)
August 28, 2014 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Directing Plaintiff To Cure Deficiency, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 08/28/14. (nmarb, )
October 1, 2014 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Drawing Case. This case shall be drawn to a presiding judge and, if appropriate, to a magistrate judge, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 10/1/14. (nmarb, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Workalemahu v. Heritage Club
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Medeset Workalemahu
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heritage Club
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]