Schieffelin et al v. QVC, Inc Featured Case

Plaintiffs Stacey and David Schieffelin and Models Prefer Ltd. sued defendant QVC Inc. alleging that QVC coerced the plaintiffs into executing a distribution agreement under which defendant had the exclusive worldwide right to distribute and promote Models Prefer health and beauty products. Plaintiffs further allege that QVC has appropriated the Models Prefer trademark, converted it for their own use and purpose, have decreased the value of the Models Prefer trademark through their actions, and tortiously interfered with plaintiffs\' prospective business relations.

Plaintiff: Stacey Schieffelin, David Schieffelin and Models Prefer Ltd
Defendant: QVC, Inc
Case Number: 3:2007cv00445
Filed: March 21, 2007
Court: Connecticut District Court
Office: New Haven Office
County: New Haven
Presiding Judge: Stefan R. Underhill
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Tort/Non-Motor Vehicle
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 4, 2007 11
Corporate Disclosure Statement by QVC, Inc. (Dubitsky, Doug)
May 7, 2007 12
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by QVC, Inc re 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Dubitsky, Doug)
May 8, 2007 13 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER OF TRANSFER. Case reassigned to Judge Vanessa L. Bryant for all further proceedings. Signed by Clerk on 5/8/2007. (Kunofsky, L.)
May 22, 2007 14 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER RE: Transferred Case. Counsel/Parties please see attached order. Joint Status Report due by 6/6/2007. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 5/22/07. (Wood, R.)
June 4, 2007 15
MOTION for Extension of Time until June 21, 2007 of the Scheduling Order by Stacey Schieffelin, David Schieffelin, Models Prefer Ltd. (Gersten, Eliot)
June 5, 2007 16
MOTION to Amend/Correct 15 MOTION for Extension of Time until June 21, 2007 of the Scheduling Order by Stacey Schieffelin, David Schieffelin, Models Prefer Ltd.Responses due by 6/26/2007 (Gersten, Eliot)
June 15, 2007 18
Joint STATUS REPORT by Stacey Schieffelin, David Schieffelin, Models Prefer Ltd, QVC, Inc. (Gersten, Eliot)
July 3, 2007 19
MOTION for Extension of Time for filing 26f Report and Defendant's Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint by Stacey Schieffelin, David Schieffelin, Models Prefer Ltd. (Gersten, Eliot)
March 21, 2007 1
COMPLAINT against QVC, Inc ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number H022068), filed by Stacey Schieffelin, David Schieffelin, Models Prefer Ltd.(Bauer, J.)
July 17, 2007 21
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Case by all plaintiffs (Gersten, Eliot)
March 21, 2007 2
Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Motions to Dismiss due on 6/21/2007.Amended Pleadings due by 5/20/2007.,Discovery due by 9/20/2007.,Dispositive Motions due by 10/20/2007.. Signed by Clerk on 3/21/07. (Bauer, J.)
March 21, 2007 3 Opinion or Order of the Court
ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 3/21/07. (Bauer, J.)
April 4, 2007 4
NOTICE of Appearance by Doug Dubitsky on behalf of QVC, Inc (Dubitsky, Doug)
April 5, 2007 5
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Nathniel Metz. Filing Fee $25.00. Receipt Number B013994. by QVC, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Nathaniel Metz# 2 Affidavit of Doug Dubitsky)(Sanders, C.)
April 5, 2007 6
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac vice Attorney John E. Bisordi. Filing Fee $25.00. Receipt Number B013994. by QVC, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of John E. Bisordi# 2 Affidavit of Doug Dubitsky)(Sanders, C.)
May 1, 2007 9
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time until June 5, 2007 and June 15, 2007 respectively to Hold Rule 26(f) conference and file Form 26(f) by Stacey Schieffelin, David Schieffelin, Models Prefer Ltd, QVC, Inc. (Dubitsky, Doug)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schieffelin et al v. QVC, Inc
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stacey Schieffelin
Represented By: Eliot B. Gersten
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Schieffelin
Represented By: Eliot B. Gersten
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Models Prefer Ltd
Represented By: Eliot B. Gersten
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: QVC, Inc
Represented By: Doug Dubitsky
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]