Coale v. Metro-North RR Co

Plaintiff: William Coale
Defendant: Metro-North RR Co
 
Case Number: 3:2009cv02065
Filed: December 18, 2009
 
Court: Connecticut District Court
Office: New Haven Office
County: New Haven
Presiding Judge: Charles S. Haight, Jr.
 
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: No cause code entered
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
May 16, 2011 35 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING granting Plaintiff's 25 Motion to Compel filed on February 21, 2011. Signed by Judge Charles S. Haight, Jr. on May 16, 2011. (Wilson, D.)
January 7, 2014 92 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER (see attached) - While much of the parties' briefing concerns whether Defendant "perceived Mr. Coale as disabled within the meaning of the ADA," see 69 at 2, implicating the possible applicability of prong (C) of 42 U.S.C.  7; 12102(2) (2008) to the facts alleged in the case at bar, the briefs do not address at any length the applicability of prong (B) under the same statute. The Court therefore raises the question of this prong's applicability sua sponte. In con sequence, the Court directs the parties to address the applicability, if any, of 42 U.S.C. § 12102(2)(B) (2008) to this action. Counsel should include in their discussion the applicability and effect, if any, of the Second Circuit's holdin g in Horwitz v. L. &. J.G. Stickley, Inc., 20 Fed. Appx. 76, 2001 WL 1220511 (2d Cir. 2001). Supplemental briefs discussing these issues must be exchanged and filed simultaneously not later than Friday, February 7, 2014. Signed by Judge Charles S. Haight, Jr. on 1/7/14.(Hornstein, A)
March 12, 2014 95 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER (see attached) - Under the evidentiary record and controlling law, the Court, while it is sympathetic to Plaintiff's claims, GRANTS 56 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment in all respects. The Clerk is directed to close the case. Signed by Judge Charles S. Haight, Jr. on 3/12/14. (Hornstein, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Coale v. Metro-North RR Co
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Coale
Represented By: Scott E. Perry
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metro-North RR Co
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]