Jacoby & Meyers Law Offices, LLP v. Judges of the Connecticut Superior Court Featured Case

Plaintiff Jacoby & Meyers Law Offices, LLP seeks to enjoin the Judges of the Connecticut superior Court from enforcing Connecticut's Rules of Professional Conduct Rule 5.4, which prohibits nonlawyers from holding an interest in a professional corporation, association or limited liability entity authorized to practice law for profit.

Plaintiff: Jacoby & Meyers Law Offices, LLP
Defendant: Judges of the Connecticut Superior Court
 
Case Number: 3:2011cv00817
Filed: May 18, 2011
 
Court: Connecticut District Court
Office: New Haven Office
County: New Haven
Presiding Judge: Christopher F. Droney
 
Nature of Suit: Constitutionality of State Statutes
Cause of Action: 28:1343
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case
Date Filed#Document Text
June 21, 2011 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert J. Deichert on behalf of Judges of the Connecticut Superior Court (Deichert, Robert)
June 14, 2011 Answer deadline updated for Judges of the Connecticut Superior Court to 8/18/2011. (Johnson, D.)
June 14, 2011 10 Featured Case ORDER granting 9 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Christopher F. Droney on 6/14/11. (Droney, Christopher)
June 13, 2011 9 MOTION for Extension of Time until 08/18/2011 to respond to complaint 1 Complaint by Judges of the Connecticut Superior Court. (Skold, Michael)
June 13, 2011 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Skold on behalf of Judges of the Connecticut Superior Court (Skold, Michael)
June 7, 2011 7 ENTERED IN ERROR... AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Civil Cover Sheet, Complaint, Rule 7.1 Statement, Order of Pretrial Deadlines, Electronic Filing Order in Civil Cases and Notice to Counsel served on Perry Zinn Rowthorn for the Office of the Attorney General on 05/23/2011, filed by Jacoby & Meyers Law Offices, LLP. (Carton, Jeffrey) Modified on 6/14/2011 - Clerk to re-docket with the correct event (Gothers, M.).
May 19, 2011 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Judges of the Connecticut Superior Court* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Jeffrey I. Carton* *Meiselman, Denlea, Packman, Carton & Eberz* *1311 Mamaroneck Ave., PO Box 5057* * White Plains, NY 10602*. (Gothers, M.)
May 19, 2011 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel initiating or removing this action is responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of 1 Complaint filed by Jacoby & Meyers Law Offices, LLP, 3 Electronic Filing Order, 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Jacoby & Meyers Law Offices, LLP, 4 Order on Pretrial Deadlines. Signed by Clerk on 5/19/2011. (Gothers, M.)
May 18, 2011 4 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Motions to Dismiss due on 8/18/2011. Amended Pleadings due by 7/17/2011 Discovery due by 11/17/2011 Dispositive Motions due by 12/17/2011. Signed by Clerk on 5/18/2011. (Gothers, M.)
May 18, 2011 3 Featured Case ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Christopher F. Droney on 5/18/2011. (Gothers, M.)
May 18, 2011 Judge Christopher F. Droney added. (Simpson, T.)
May 18, 2011 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 by Jacoby & Meyers Law Offices, LLP. (Carton, Jeffrey)
May 18, 2011 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to All Defendants. (Carton, Jeffrey)
May 18, 2011 1 COMPLAINT For Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against The Judges of the Connecticut ( Filing fee $350 receipt number 0205-2121228.), filed by Jacoby & Meyers Law Offices, LLP. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Carton, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Jacoby & Meyers Law Offices, LLP v. Judges of the Connecticut Superior Court
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacoby & Meyers Law Offices, LLP
Represented By: Jeffrey I. Carton
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judges of the Connecticut Superior Court
Represented By: Michael Skold
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]