Bank of New York Mellon v. Bell et al

Defendant: Sonja V. Bell, Jonathan Bell and Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation
Plaintiff: Bank of New York Mellon
Case Number: 3:2011cv01255
Filed: August 9, 2011
Court: Connecticut District Court
Office: New Haven Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Warren W. Eginton
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 19, 2013 105 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 87 MOTION for Reconsideration re 71 Order, 70 Scheduling Order Determining Case No Longer Stayed by Jonathan Bell, Sonja Bell. The Court adheres to its decision to deny a stay. Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 9/19/13. (Ladd-Smith, I.)
December 18, 2014 274 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OF DECISION. On the basis of all of the evidence and arguments, I find in plaintiff's favor. A judgment of strict foreclosure shall enter accordingly. With respect to plaintiff's request for scheduling of law days and an immediat e order of possession of the property, the parties shall jointly submit a proposed consent order to set such schedule; if they are unable to agree on the terms of such an order, the parties shall appear before the Court for a hearing to set such schedule. That hearing is set for 1/8/2015 at 3:30 PM in Courtroom Two, 915 Lafayette Blvd., Bridgeport, CT before Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer. Please see attached ruling. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 12/18/2014.(Ramesh, S)
February 24, 2015 310 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Plaintiffs Motion for Attorneys Fees and Costs 265 is granted in the amount of $179,784.56. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 2/24/2015. (Pollack, R.)
February 24, 2015 311 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Defendants motion for a new trial 293 is DENIED. By separate order, the Court has also granted plaintiffs motion for attorneys fees and costs. Plaintiff shall submit a proposed order of judgment and setting forth law days. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 2/24/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Tesco v. Fibredyne, 2:90-cv-856) (Pollack, R.)
September 25, 2012 49 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OF DECISION denying 23 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 9/25/2012. (Candee, D.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bank of New York Mellon v. Bell et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sonja V. Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bank of New York Mellon
Represented By: Geoffrey K. Milne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]