Lepore v. H&L Chevrolet, Inc.,

Plaintiff: Michael Lepore
Defendant: H & L Chevrolet, Inc.,
 
Case Number: 3:2011cv01338
Filed: August 22, 2011
 
Court: Connecticut District Court
Office: New Haven Office
County: Fairfield
Presiding Judge: Robert N. Chatigny
 
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
January 5, 2012 17 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE & ORDER: A Settlement Conference is scheduled for 2/29/2012 at 1:00 PM in Chambers Room 262, 450 Main St., Hartford, CT before Judge Donna F. Martinez. See attached order for important instructions.(Constantine, A.)
February 21, 2012 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: At the request of counsel, the settlement conference with Judge Martinez is RESCHEDULED to 4/17/2012 at 1:00 PM in Chambers Room 262, 450 Main St., Hartford, CT. See attached order for instructions. (Constantine, A.)
April 3, 2012 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER : At the joint request of counsel, the settlement conference is RESCHEDULED to 5/16/2012 at 1:00 PM in Chambers Room 262, 450 Main St., Hartford, CT. See attached order for important instructions. Signed by Judge Donna F. Martinez on 4/3/12. (Constantine, A.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Lepore v. H&L Chevrolet, Inc.,
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Lepore
Represented By: Judith A. Mauzaka
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H & L Chevrolet, Inc.,
Represented By: Rosemarie Barretta
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]