Briggs v. Bremby

Defendant: Roderick Bremby
Plaintiff: James Briggs
Case Number: 3:2012cv00324
Filed: March 5, 2012
Court: Connecticut District Court
Office: New Haven Office
County: Hartford
Presiding Judge: Vanessa L. Bryant
Nature of Suit: Welfare
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 24, 2014 101 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part the Defendant's 84 Motion to Alter Judgment and/or Motion for Reconsideration. See the attached memorandum of decision. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 3/24/2014. (Burkart, B.)
December 4, 2012 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 3 Motion for Release of Bond Obligation; denying 19 Motion to Dismiss; granting 2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. See attached memorandum of decision. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 12/4/2012. (Fernandez, Melissa)
May 13, 2013 82 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER certifying class. See attached Order. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 5/13/2013.(Fernandez, Melissa)
May 13, 2013 83 Opinion or Order of the Court Preliminary Injunction Order. See attached Order Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 5/13/2013.(Fernandez, Melissa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Briggs v. Bremby
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roderick Bremby
Represented By: Hugh Barber
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Briggs
Represented By: Gregory Lee Bass
Represented By: Lucy Potter
Represented By: Cecil Joseph Thomas
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]