Lavatec Laundry Technology GmbH v. Lavatec, Inc.

Defendant: Lavatec, Inc.
Plaintiff: Lavatec Laundry Technology GmbH
Case Number: 3:2013cv00056
Filed: January 11, 2013
Court: Connecticut District Court
Office: New Haven Office
County: New Haven
Presiding Judge: Stefan R. Underhill
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1051 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 3, 2014 113 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OF DECISION AND ORDER denying as moot 38 Motion to Dismiss; denying as moot 44 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying as moot 49 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; denying as moot 60 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying as moot 65 Motion to Dismiss; denying as moot 101 Motion in Limine. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 9/3/2014. (Oliver, T.)
November 13, 2014 140 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 127 Motion for Permanent Injunction. The motion is denied without prejudice insofar as the relief it seeks is a permanent injunction. It is granted in substatial part in the form of a preliminary injunction. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 11/13/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Lavatec mark)) (Pollack, R.)
November 21, 2014 144 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OF DECISION AND AMENDED INJUNCTION ORDER Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 11/21/2014.(Pollack, R.)
April 25, 2014 99 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 98 Joint Motion for Resolution of Discovery Dispute (Defendant's Motion to Compel). Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 4/25/2014. (Martin, M.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lavatec Laundry Technology GmbH v. Lavatec, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lavatec, Inc.
Represented By: John C. Linderman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lavatec Laundry Technology GmbH
Represented By: Nicole Helen Najam
Represented By: David A. Slossberg
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]